Lesson 1 Homework 5.2 Answer Key

Posted on

Lesson 1 Homework 5.2 asks you to multiply multi digit whole numbers and multiples of 10 using place value patterns and the distributive and associative properties. If you finished doing this lesson homework and want to check how much you get right, this post has the answer key for you.

If you have not done your homework, you are encouraged to try first and do not cheat by copying the whole thing featured here. Cheating is never allowed and it is always better to try first even though you have a hard time and your answers are incorrect.

1. Fill in the blanks using your knowledge of place value units and basic facts.

a. 43 x 30

Think: 43 ones x 3 tens = 129 tens

43 x 30 = 1,290

b. 430 x 30

Think: 43 tens x 3 tens = 129 hundreds

430 x 30 = 12,900

c. 830 x 20

Think: 83 tens x 2 tens = 166 hundreds

830 x 20 = 16,600

d. 4,400 x 400

44 hundreds x 4 hundreds = 176 ten thousands

4,400 x 400 = 1,760,000

e. 80 x 5,000

8 tens x 5 thousands = 40 ten thousands

2. Determine if these equations are true or false. Defend your answer using your knowledge of place value and the commutative, associative, and/or distributive properties.

a. 35 hundreds = 5 tens x 77 tens

= 3,500 = 3,500

The answer to the question is true.

b. 770 x 6 = 77 x 66 x 100

= 4,620 = 46,200

The answer to the question is false.

c. 50 tens x 4 hundreds = 40 tens x 5 hundreds

= 500 x 400 = 400 x 500

= 200,000 = 200,000

The answer to the question is true.

d. 24 x 10 x 90 = 90 x 2,400

= 240 x 90

= 21,600 = 216,000

The answer to the question is false.

3. Find the products. Show your thinking. The first row gives some ideas for showing your thinking.

a. 5 x 5 = 25

5 x 50 = 25 x 10 = 250

50 x 50 = (5 x 10) x (5 x 10) = (5 x 5) x 100 = 2,500

50 x 500 = (5 x 5) x (10 x 100) = 25,000

b. 80 x 5 = 400

80 x 50 = 40 x 100 = 4,000

800 x 500 = 8 x 100 x 5 x 100 = 40 x 10,000 = 400,000

8,000 x 50 = (8 x 1,000) x (5 x 10) = 40 x 10,000 = 400,000

c. 6637 x 3 = 1,911

6,370 x 30 = (6637 x 10) x (3 x 10) = 1,911 x 100 = 191,100

6,370 x 300 = (637 x 10) x (3 x 100) = 1,911 x 1,000 = 1,911,000

663,700 x 300 = (6637 x 100) x (3 x 100) = 1,911 x 10,000 = 19,110,000

4. A concrete stepping stone measures 20 square inches. What is the area of 30 such stones?

Stepping stone: 20 in2

Number of 5 s: 30

30

 

————

20 in2

The area of 30 stones is 600 in2.

5. A number is 42,300 when multiplied by 10. Find the product of this number and 500.

___ x 10 = 42,300

42,300 : 10 = ___

The number is 4,230.

4,230 x 500 = 2,115,000

4,230 multiplied by 500 gives a product of 2,115,000.

Before doing the Lesson 1 Homework 5.2, you will have to do the Lesson 1 Problem Set 5.2 first. Here is the answer key of it:

1. Fill in the blanks using your knowledge of place value units and basic facts.

a. 23 x 20

Think: 23 ones x 2 tens = 46 tens

23 x 20 = 460

b. 230 x 20

Think: 23 tens x 2 tens = 466 hundreds

230 x 20 = 4,600

c. 41 x 4

41 ones x 4 ones = 164 ones

41 x 4 = 164

d. 410 x 400

41 tens x 4 hundreds = 164 thousands

410 x 400 = 164,000

e. 3,310 x 300

331 tens x 3 hundreds = 993 thousands

3,310 x 300 = 993,000

f. 500 x 6600

5 hundreds x 6 hundreds = 30 ten thousands

500 x 600 = 300,000

2. Determine if these equations are true or false. Defend your answer using your knowledge of place value and the commutative, associative, and/or distributive properties.

a. 6 tens = 2 tens x 3 tens                                          6 x 10 = 60

60 = 20 x 30                                                                2 x 10 + 3 x 10 = 20 x 30 = 600

The answer to the question is false.

b. 44 x 20 x 10 = 440 x 2                                              44 x 2 x 10 x 10 = 88 x 100 = 8,800

440 x 20                                                                        440 x 2 = 880

The answer to the question is false.

c. 86 ones x 90 hundreds = 86 ones x 900 tens 86 x 90 x 100 = 866 x 9,000 = 774,000

86 x 9,000 = 86 x 9,000                                           86 x 900 x 10 = 86 x 9,000 = 774,000

The answer to the question is true.

d. 64 x 8 x 100 = 640 x 10                                           664 x 8 x 100 = 512 x 100 = 51,200

66400 x 8 = 640 x 8                                                  640 x 8 x 10 = 66,400 x 8 = 51,200

The answer to the question is true.

e. 57 x 2 x 10 x 10 = 570 x 2 x 10                              57 x 2 x 10 x 10 x 10 = 114 x 1,000 = 114,000

114,000 = 11,400                                                      570 x 2 x 10 = 5,700 x 2 = 11,400

The answer to the question is false.

You can open this link if you want to find the rest of the answer key: http://www.serflo1.com/Module%202%20Part%201.pdf. Feel free to download it if you want so that you can check it out later.

 

 

Leave a Reply

Your email address will not be published.